Case Information: 44843 | |||
Short Caption: | AMERICAN RELIABLE INS. CO. VS. STATE (CIVIL) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C188362 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Douglas | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/09/2005 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
03/09/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of James C. Gallo Jr.--check no. 355. | ||
03/09/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-04778 | |
03/29/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-06079 | |
04/06/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | ||
05/19/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File a Request for Transcripts. | 05-09807 | |
05/20/2005 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed May 19, 2005. The clerk shall file the transcript request form received on May 11, 2005. | 05-10048 | |
05/20/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/03/04, 12/12/04, 02/04/03, 05/02/03, 04/02/04, 06/02/04, 05/07/04, 07/02/04, 12/03/04, and 02/04/05. To Court Reporter: J. D'Amato, K. McDonald, M. Cook, J. Liston, and Court Reporter Dept. 1. | 05-09256 | |
09/29/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to file Opening Brief and Appendix and to file Transcripts. Opening brief and appendix due: 15 days. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Transcripts due: 20 days. If more time is need the court reporter/recorder shall file a motion or if the transcript cannot be produced, notify this court in writing. | 05-19348 | |
10/17/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix. | 05-20424 | |
10/17/2005 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Court Reporter Paula Walsh. They have never been served with a request for transcripts in this case. | 05-20539 | |
10/17/2005 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Courtesy copy of letter address to Court Reporter Paula Walsh from James C. Gallo regarding transcripts (FILED PER ORDER OF 11/10/05). | 05-20606 | |
11/03/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: February 4, 2003. Court Reporter: J.A. D'Amato. | 05-21684 | |
11/07/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 02/04/05, 12/03/04, 07/02/04, and 05/02/03. Court Reporter: Paula Walsh. | 05-21959 | |
11/10/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Opening Brief due: 30 days. Appellants: Serve court reporters and recorders with transcript request and pay deposit (if they have not already done so) within 5 days. Transcripts due: 20 days. Mr. Gallo - 15 days to show cause for failing to comply with appellate rules. Fn1 [The clerk shall file the letter received on October 17, 2005.] Fn 2 [If appellants have now paid the required deposit for the transcripts they shall file with this court proof of such payment.] Fn3 [The court reporters and recorders shall immediately notify this court if they do not receive the appropriate deposit for the requested transcripts as directed by this order.] | 05-22162 | |
11/10/2005 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Courtesy copy of letter address to Court Reporter Paula Walsh from James C. Gallo regarding transcripts. | 05-20606 | |
11/22/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 05-23054 | |
12/16/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Order Imposing Sanctions and Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellants' counsel, attorney James C. Gallo's conduct warrants the imposition of sanctions. Attorney James C. Gallo shall have 15 days to personally pay the sum of $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library. Within that same time period, Mr. Gallo shall also file poof of such payment with the clerk of this court. We grant appellants' motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal." This appeal is dismissed." SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 05-24478 | |
12/16/2005 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. | ||
12/21/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Received Proof of Payment of Sanction. Payment of $500 to Supreme Court Law Library on 12/21/05--check no. 569. | ||
12/27/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Reconsideration of Order Imposing Sanction. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. | 05-25111 | |
01/04/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of motion for reconsideration. | 06-00195 | |
04/07/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for Reconsideration. On December 16, 2005, this court entered an order that granted appellants' motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal and also imposed sanctions on attorney James C. Gallo. Mr. Gallo has moved for reconsideration of this court's order imposing sanctions. No good cause appearing, we deny the motion for reconsideration. | 06-07439 |