Case Information: 42877 | |||
Short Caption: | PIERCE (GILBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR031110 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/23/2004 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/02/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-03977 | |
03/18/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-05161 | |
03/18/2004 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/11/03. To Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. | 04-05162 | |
03/25/2004 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Courtesy copy of order filed in district court on March 22, 2004 regarding transcripts. | 04-05632 | |
03/31/2004 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/11/03. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. | 04-06003 | |
06/30/2004 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 04-12073 | |
06/30/2004 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 04-12076 | |
08/02/2004 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 04-13991 | |
08/30/2004 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 04-15750 | |
09/23/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 04-17620 | |
09/23/2004 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/02/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD | 04-21951 | |
12/28/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-22363 | |
12/28/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/28/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 3, 2005. | 04-22363 |