Case Information: 42891 | |||
Short Caption: | MATTHEWS (DAVID) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR032555 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/04/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 04-04119 | |
03/04/2004 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: January 30, 2004. Court Reporter: C. Vohl. Filed in district court on: March 1, 2004. | 04-04120 | |
03/04/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment/Order Appealed from and District Court Minutes. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/10/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Corrected Notice of Appeal) | 04-04525 | |
03/10/2004 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: January 30, 2004. Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. | 04-04545 | |
04/05/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 04-06215 | |
04/05/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 04-06217 | |
04/22/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 04-07441 | |
06/14/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD | 04-10887 | |
07/09/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-11443 | |
07/09/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/04/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2004. | 04-11443 |