judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PIERCE ASSOCIATES INC

Case Information: 86-CV-0375
Short Caption:DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PIERCE ASSOCIATES INCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA6893-84Filed Date:02/26/1986

Opening Event Date:02/26/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/01/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/30/1986
Argued/Submitted:05/06/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Lutz Alexander Prager YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Jack Rephan YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Andrew W. Stephenson NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA ET AL PIERCE ASSOCIATES INC ET AL
02/26/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/01/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/30/1986FiledBriefing Completed
05/06/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/11/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition