Case Information: 42878 | |||
Short Caption: | HARPER VS. DIST. CT. (HARPER) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D309477 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Cert/Man/Pro |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/03/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Bradley J. Hofland--check no. 1620. | ||
03/03/2004 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. | 04-03993 | |
03/03/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. | 04-03994 | |
03/03/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/04/2004 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: February 10, 2004. Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | 04-04061 | |
03/04/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. for writ petition. | 04-04129 | |
03/05/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (amended). | 04-04245 | |
03/08/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of Matthew Rulon Harper in Support of Petition for a Writ of Mandamus, Prohibition and Certiorari Pursuant to NRS 34.170, 34.330, 34.030, 15010(1) and (2). | 04-04414 | |
03/11/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of Service. | 04-04625 | |
03/12/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Prohibition, Mandamus, or Certiorari. "We deny the petition." NNP04S-MS/NB/MG | 04-04711 | |
03/12/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Petitioner's Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pursuant to NRAP 8; Affidavit of Bradley J. Hofland. | 04-04755 | |
04/06/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 04-04750 | |
04/06/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/08/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for Stay as Moot. On March 12, 2004, the petition was denied. On the same day, petitioner moved this court for a stay of the district court proceedings. We deny petitioner's motion for stay as moot. | 04-06541 |