judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GLEN T. LAMBERT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0212
Short Caption:GLEN T. LAMBERT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bail Reform Act
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9502-85Filed Date:02/25/1987

Opening Event Date:02/25/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/30/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/27/1989
Argued/Submitted:06/13/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/21/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGlen T. Lambert N
Matthew W. Black YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia A. Riley YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LAMBERT, GLEN T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/12/88 ORD GRT APLE MO FO NOTE - 01 EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO NOTE - 02 12/19/88 AND ANY FURTHER REQ. NOTE - 02 WILL BE LOOKED UPON W/DISFAVOR NOTE - 03 AND GRT ONLY IN EXTRAORDINARY NOTE - 03 CIRCUMSTANCES.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/06/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BLACKM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - RILEYPA FOR - APPELLEE
02/25/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/09/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR BAIL/BOND PENDING APPEAL OF APPELLANT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1987APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET BOND PENDING APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD OPE
03/25/1987RECEIVED SUPPLEMENT OF APPELLANT TO MOTION FOR BOND PENDING APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1987ORDER DENY MO FOR BOND PENDING APPEAL. ACG PANELNBST SCDATE 040687 SCHPRD CHECK
04/23/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (327 PGS - GRAYBILL) JB PANEL SCDATE 042987 SCHPRD R
04/30/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/11/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 060987 SCHPRD BA
08/10/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS CT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD OPE
06/14/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (484 PGS - GRAYBILL) GT PANEL SCDATE 061888 SCHPRD RT
07/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/15/88 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD BA
08/15/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD BA
09/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/19/88 (NO OPA) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD BE
10/20/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 19, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 101988 SCHPRD BE
11/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 19TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FILEDS: 1-3 PB PANELRO SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD V
12/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BE
12/21/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MLBE FILED 12-21-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD OPA
01/27/1989FiledBriefing Completed
01/27/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BE; CLK TO SCHED AS SOON AS CALENDAR PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 012489 SCHPRD N
06/13/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/13/1989ARGUED PANELNWSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/21/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD