judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALEXANDER H. FOWLKES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0221
Short Caption:ALEXANDER H. FOWLKES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8154-86Filed Date:03/04/1987

Opening Event Date:03/04/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/28/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlexander H. Fowlkes N
David J. Sitomer NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FOWLKES, ALEXANDER H. AKA ALEXANDER H. FOWLER, JR. UNITED STATES
03/04/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID SITOMER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS TO MAY 8TH JB TTC PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD DSA
05/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (13 PGS - RUST) JB PANEL SCDATE 050487 SCHPRD R
05/08/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 050887 SCHPRD DSA
01/11/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXPEDITE TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/11/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXPEDITE RT TO EXTENT THAT CT RPTR TO FILE EST COMP DATE OF RT IN 10 DAYS PANELPY SCDATE 012588 SCHPRD OPE
03/01/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO FILE RT OF 12/16- 12/19/86 TR PROCEEDINGS BY MAY 23, 1988-ABSOLUTELY-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD STATE
06/13/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (292 PGS - SCHERTZER) GT PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD RT
07/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/26/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD BA
09/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 26TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10/26/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD V
10/26/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 102688 SCHPRD BA
11/07/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/07/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 102788 SCHPRD V
11/07/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
11/28/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD