judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FISCHER, STEVEN G. PROJECT CAPITAL CORPORATION

Case Information: 86-CV-0372
Short Caption:FISCHER, STEVEN G. PROJECT CAPITAL CORPORATIONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA3572-81Filed Date:02/25/1986

Opening Event Date:02/25/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/18/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/12/1987
Argued/Submitted:05/18/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/26/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard W. LuchsYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Morris Kletzkin YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FISCHER, STEVEN G. ET AL PROJECT CAPITAL CORPORATION
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/9/86 ORD: DENYING MO FOR NOTE - 01 SUMMARY REVERSAL; GRANTING MO NOTE - 02 TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD; CLK NOTE - 02 TO FILE ATTACHMENTS TO APLT'S NOTE - 03 MOTION AS A SUPPLEMENTAL NOTE - 03 RECORD; COUNSEL FOR APLT TO NOTE - 04 FILE STATEMENT W/RESPECT TO NOTE - 04 STATUS OF REPORTER'S TRANS IN NOTE - 05 10 DAYS. NOTE - 05
01/01/1905TRDATE- 87/05/18 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LUCHSR FOR - APPELLANTS ATTY 2 - KLETZKINM FOR - APPELLEE
02/25/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/07/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1986APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1986MEMORANDUM NO 7A...DR/SRT DUE APRIL 24th PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 042486 SCHPRD DR
04/16/1986STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1986RECORD ON APPEAL RTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1986APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD (SUPPLEMENT ATTACHED) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1986APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL JB PANEL SCDATE 051286 SCHPRD OPE
05/21/1986APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-05 CWC PANELNWFE SCDATE 070186 SCHPRD VS
07/09/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (ATTACHMENTS TO APLT'S MO FOR LV TO SUPP RECORD) CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1986STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT GG PANEL SCDATE 072186 SCHPRD ANSA
09/18/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/18/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (40 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1986ORDER APLT BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 072386 SCHPRD CHECK
11/07/1986APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 111886 SCHPRD BA
12/09/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 12, 1987 (NO OPPO) (M-9) RJG TTC PANEL SCDATE 120986 SCHPRD BE
01/12/1987FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 011287 SCHPRD BE
01/16/1987APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (M-16) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/18/1987ARGUED PANELMKNWFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLEE RE ORAL ARGUMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELMKNWFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/26/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD