Case Information: 42887 | |||
Short Caption: | METZ VS. MINI'S ON PARR | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 42531 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0206848 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 07/14/2004 / King, Patrick | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/04/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 04-04076 | |
03/08/2004 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on March 3, 2004. | 04-04419 | |
05/17/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Kenneth J. McKenna. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Nos. 42531 and 42887 (not consolidated.) | 04-09148 | |
06/02/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-10101 | |
06/30/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. These related appeals arise from District Court Case Number CV0206848 and were docketed as proper person appeals. On March 2, 2004, appellant submitted a proper person letter in Docket No. 42531. On March 8, 2004, respondents moved for leave to respond to appellant's proper person letter. On May 17, 2004, attorney Kenneth J. McKenna filed a notice of appearance on behalf of appellant in these appeals. Because appellant is now represented by counsel, we decline to grant appellant permission to file documents in proper person. See 46(b). The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the proper person document received on March 2, 2004. Further, we direct the clerk of this court to issue notices assigning these appeals to the settlement conference program. See NRAP 16. In light of this order, we deny respondents' motion as moot. Furthermore, because this is no longer a proper person appeal, we vacate our February 18, 2004, order in Docket No. 42531 that directed the district court clerk to transmit the complete trial court record. Nos. 42531/42887 – cases are not consolidated. | 04-12020 | |
07/14/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
09/17/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 42531/42887-cases are not consolidated. | 04-17241 | |
09/17/2004 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Nos. 42531/42887-cases are not consolidated.. | 04-17242 | |
09/17/2004 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. Nos. 42531/42887-cases are not consolidated. | 04-17243 | |
09/23/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 04-17609 | |
09/23/2004 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |