judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONNELL FELDER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1478
Short Caption:DONNELL FELDER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F477-86Filed Date:12/14/1989

Opening Event Date:12/14/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/06/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/29/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/21/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonnell Felder N
James W. KleinNY
Stephen I. Singer YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FELDER, DONNELL UNITED STATES
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y JUDGE - KI AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/04/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SINGERS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - WIEGANDB FOR - APPELLEE
12/14/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/28/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD DSA
01/23/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR SHELTON CERTIFICATION OF 11/3/88 PROC. (ORDER CANCELLED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR BURNS CERTIFICATION OF 4/6/87 - 4/15/87 PROC. (RT PREVIOUSLY PREPARED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/06/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 021490 SCHPRD R
02/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(98 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 030790 SCHPRD RT
02/07/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(10 PGS. -- BURNS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(20 PGS/PIRFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/20/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD BA
02/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (8 PGS. -- GOAD; 9 PGS. -- BURNS; 11 PGS. -- BURNS; 6 PGS. -- BURNS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(17 PGS. -- GOAD) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (6 PGS. -- SWARINGER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7(182 PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (9-PGS/CALHOUN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BR, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELDDW SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD U
04/04/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 (7 PGS. -- HUNT; 5 PGS. -- HART; 9 PGS. --HART) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #10 PGS. -- (10 PGS. -- HART) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF RPTR FARMER TO EXT TIME TO FILE 10/31/89 - 11/4/89 PROC. TO JUNE 27, 1990 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(23 PGS/SALAZAR) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990ORDER GRANT RPTR FARMER EXTENSION TO FILE 10/31/89 - 11/4/89 PROC., RT DUE BY JUNE 27TH (NFX) JB PANELRO SCDATE 051390 SCHPRD RT
05/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #13 (116-PGS/HUNT) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #12 13 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD RT
05/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #14(7 PGS-RAMOS) PF PANEL SCDATE 050890 SCHPRD RT
06/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #15 (12 PGS. SIMMS & 32 PGS. WRAY) PR PANEL SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD RT
07/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #16(229 PGS/FARMER) AD PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD RT
08/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #17 (384-PGS/FARMER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 092490 SCHPRD CHECK
11/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-12-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 111390 SCHPRD BA
11/20/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 12/12/90. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 111590 SCHPRD B
12/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 121290 SCHPRD BA
12/13/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1991RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991FiledBriefing Completed
01/29/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL LODGE BRF, BRFS OF APLT & APLE FL, SCHED FOR CONSIDERATION. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 010891 SCHPRD B
04/02/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1991RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S UNOPPOSED MOT TO FILE REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELPC SCDATE 040291 SCHPRD VS
04/05/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 041591 SCHPRD OPE
04/12/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/12/1991ARGUED PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD PER REQUEST AT ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1991MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING DOCUMENTS RE- QUESTED AT TIME OF ARGUMENT TO DIVISION. MEH PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM...CAUSE RM FOR VACATUR OF ONE CONVICTION (MERGER) PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE 595 A.2d 974
07/26/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 2058
08/09/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC FOR 15 DAY EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1991ORDER GRNT APLT'S MO X TM TO FLD REH /REH EB & PET TO BE FLD W/IN 15 DAYS FRM DATE OF THIS ORD. PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APLT TO 10 DAYS PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1991ORDER APLT'S MO FOR X TM FL PET REH/ REH EB IS GRNTD & TO BE FLD ON OR BEFORE 9/12/91 NFX. CT PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1991PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF APPELLANT PANEL SCDATE 091291 SCHPRD MRRB
10/24/1991ORDER THAT APLE W/I 20 DAYS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH REH EN BANC (10 COPIES) SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1991APPELLEE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO 2 WEEKS - NO OPPO PMB PANEL SCDATE 111391 SCHPRD ANSE
11/15/1991ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL OPPO & OPPO TO PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC DUE ON 11/27/91 SL PANELRO SCDATE 112591 SCHPRD OPA
11/27/1991APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR REHEARING OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 112791 SCHPRD OPE
01/21/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD