judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAUL E. DYER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1476
Short Caption:PAUL E. DYER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1322-86Filed Date:12/11/1989

Opening Event Date:12/11/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaul E. Dyer N
Barbara E. SosnickNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DYER, PAUL E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 01/03/90 ORD: E. SOSNICK, ESQ NOTE - 01 APTD TO REPT APLT; DSA IN 89- NOTE - 02 1476 DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 CON: 87-78 NOTE - 03
12/11/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/03/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BARBARA E. SOSNICK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 87-78 & 89- 1476 FOR ALL PURP; FO BARBARA (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 & 2) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 011690 SCHPRD DSA
02/14/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 020990 SCHPRD R
04/13/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/13/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL. GW PANELRO SCDATE 031690 SCHPRD RT
04/13/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
04/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD