judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GUERTIN, STEPHEN GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY

Case Information: 86-CV-0362
Short Caption:GUERTIN, STEPHEN GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Lead: 85-CV-1573 Consolidated:86-CV-0362
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA726-84Filed Date:02/21/1986

Opening Event Date:02/21/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/10/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/02/1986
Argued/Submitted:01/21/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Herbert V. Mcknight, Jr.YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Laurence T. Scott YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GUERTIN, STEPHEN GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
02/21/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/02/1986FiledBriefing Completed
01/21/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/03/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition