Case: 09-07-00235-CR
09-07-00235-CR
05/09/2007
Aggravated Robbery
Eugene A. Priggett, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/06/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
11/06/2007 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/10/2008 | Case stored | | |||||
06/10/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||||
04/16/2008 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/16/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
04/08/2008 | Submitted | | |||||
03/18/2008 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
03/18/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
12/13/2007 | Order entered | Anders Brief filed, Pro Se Brief due | | ||||
11/21/2007 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed | | |||||
11/06/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
11/06/2007 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | | |||||
10/23/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
10/15/2007 | Notice of late brief | | |||||
10/11/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
09/14/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/11/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
08/08/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/08/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
07/10/2007 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
06/12/2007 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/12/2007 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
06/12/2007 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
05/09/2007 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
05/09/2007 | Trial court certification filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/10/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Priggett, Jr., Eugene A. | Criminal - Appellant | Grant Stevens Eugene A. Priggett Jr. |
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Gail Kikawa McConnell |
Trial Court Information
9th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Frederick E Edwards
06-06-05488 CR
20 years