Case Information: 42886 | |||
Short Caption: | BABB (LATISHA) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P0074 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/16/2004 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/03/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/03/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-04028 | |
03/09/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-04439 | |
03/16/2004 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 04-04933 | |
05/20/2004 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 04-09354 | |
05/20/2004 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. | 04-09356 | |
06/23/2004 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 04-11456 | |
08/16/2004 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed. | ||
11/04/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-20285 | |
11/30/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-20529 | |
11/30/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/09/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 1, 2004. | 04-20529 |