judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NEDRA F. PERMENTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1481
Short Caption:NEDRA F. PERMENTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F391-88Filed Date:12/15/1989

Opening Event Date:12/15/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/02/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/15/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/26/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/20/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNedra F. Permenter N
Bernard J. Simbole YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Stevan E. Bunnell YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PERMENTER, NEDRA F. AKA NEDRA P. DALE UNITED STATES
12/15/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERNARD J. SIMBOLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD DSA
02/02/1990FiledRecord Completed
03/05/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) RJG PANEL SCDATE 021390 SCHPRD R
05/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (13 PGS.- SIMMS) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(275 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 052090 SCHPRD RT
08/28/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(10 PGS/WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 052190 SCHPRD RT
09/27/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-15-90 AD NO OPPO PANEL SCDATE 100190 SCHPRD BE
10/11/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 10-15-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 092890 SCHPRD GR
10/15/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/15/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 101590 SCHPRD BE
02/26/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/26/1991SUBMITTED PANELSTSCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTSCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/20/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD