judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LUTHER T. LINZY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1392
Short Caption:LUTHER T. LINZY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F138-89Filed Date:11/20/1989

Opening Event Date:11/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/18/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/25/1991
Argued/Submitted:01/28/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLuther T. Linzy N
Matthew C. LeeferYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Demaurice F. Smith YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LINZY, LUTHER T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/27/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 BY 8/21/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 02 9/25/91; REPLY BRF OF APLT, IF NOTE - 02 ANY, DUE BY 10/15/91; SCHED NOTE - 03 CASE ON JAN 1992 CAL.; NFX. NOTE - 03
11/20/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/11/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MATTHEW C. LEEFER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 122189 SCHPRD DSA
02/22/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 011990 SCHPRD R
05/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (ORDER OF JUDGE URBINA DATED 5/2/90) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1990RECORD COMPLETED
06/27/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. EVH PANELJAC SCDATE 062191 SCHPRD V
08/26/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 082191 SCHPRD BA
08/26/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF EVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT FR LV TO FL BRF; LDGD BRF IS FL. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 082891 SCHPRD V
09/25/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 092591 SCHPRD BE
09/25/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/28/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/28/1992SUBMITTED PANELSTKGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTKGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/21/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD