judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LUTHER T. LINZY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1393
Short Caption:LUTHER T. LINZY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2102-88Filed Date:11/20/1989

Opening Event Date:11/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/20/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/25/1991
Argued/Submitted:01/28/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLuther T. Linzy N
Matthew C. LeeferYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Demaurice F. Smith YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LINZY, LUTHER T. UNITED STATES
11/20/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/11/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MATTHEW C. LEEFER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 122189 SCHPRD DSA
02/20/1990RECORD COMPLETED
02/22/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 011990 SCHPRD R
07/24/1991ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER. APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD U
08/26/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD BA
09/25/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 092591 SCHPRD BE
09/25/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/28/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/28/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (109 PGS. -- PIRFO) (6/6/89 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (237 PGS. -- TREMEL) 6/8/89 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (369 PGS. -- BURNEY) (6/7/89 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (189 PGS. -- BURNEY) (6/5/89 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1992SUBMITTED PANELSTKGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTKGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/21/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD