Case Information: 44837 | |||
Short Caption: | SCOTT (JAMES) VS. STATE C/W 44836/44838 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 44836 *, 44837, 44838 | Related Case(s): | 35145 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991678 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/09/2005 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Hardesty. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
03/09/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/09/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 05-04655 | |
03/18/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 44836, 44837, 44838. | 05-05346 | |
04/05/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed March 18, 2005. These appeals are hereby consolidated. Nos. 44836/ 44837/ 44838. (05-06633) | ||
04/11/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Nos. 44836/44837/44838 (05-07016). | ||
04/11/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Nos. 44836/44837/44838 (05-07017). | ||
05/03/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Nos. 44836/44837/44838 (05-08670). | ||
08/02/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP. Nos. 44836/44837/44838. | 05-15334 | |
08/30/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-15449 | |
08/30/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/21/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 12, 2005. | 05-15449 |