judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLAY, OZZIE MCKENZIE, CHESTER

Case Information: 86-CV-0373
Short Caption:CLAY, OZZIE MCKENZIE, CHESTERClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA11962-84Filed Date:02/25/1986

Opening Event Date:02/25/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/24/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard C. Deering NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Ronald A. Goodbread NN
AppellantMr. Ozzie Ozzie Clay NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Melissa Chappell-White NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Caroline Cooley NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CLAY, OZZIE ET AL MCKENZIE, CHESTER ET AL
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE 85-1154 & 84-45 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 120586 ORDER: APLTS TO TAKE NOTE - 02 NEC STEPS TO CAUSE RECORD TO NOTE - 03 BE PREPARED & TRANSMITTED TO NOTE - 03 THIS CT FORTHWITH; APLT BR DUE NOTE - 04 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE RECORD NOTE - 04 IS FILED W/THIS CT. NOTE - 05 11/19/87 ORD: GRANT MO TO W/D NOTE - 05 & APPEARANCE OF RONALD A. NOTE - 06 GOODBREAD IS W/D; APLTS TO NOTE - 06 INFORM THIS CRT IN 20 DAYS NOTE - 07 OF IDENTITY OF NEW COUNSEL OR NOTE - 07 WHETHER THEY WILL PROCEED PRO NOTE - 08 SE. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 1/11/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 09 TO EXT TM TO OBTAIN NEW COUNSL NOTE - 10 TO EXTENT APLTS ON OR BEFORE NOTE - 10 2/12/88 HAVE ATTORNEY ENTER NOTE - 11 APPEARANCE ON THEIR BEHALF & NOTE - 11 TAKE NECESSARY ARRANGEMENTS TO NOTE - 12 CAUSE RECORD BE PREPARED & NOTE - 12 TRANSMITTED TO THIS CRT; APLTS NOTE - 13 FAIL TO COMPLY W/ORD,CASE WILL NOTE - 13 BE DISMISSED; NFX OF OBTAINING NOTE - 14 COUNSEL. NOTE - 14
01/01/1906 GOODBREADR WITHDRAWN 11/19/87.
02/25/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/03/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1986RECEIVED STATEMENT FROM ATTORNEY RONALD A. GOODBREAD MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1986RECEIVED APLE'S AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO MOTION TO DISMISS (NEW SERVICE 4/24/86) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1986RECEIVED APLT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS GG PANEL SCDATE 051386 SCHPRD OPA
05/02/1986RECEIVED APLT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT TO 6/1/86 PANEL SCDATE 031286 SCHPRD CAS
05/08/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1986MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT TO JUNE 1, 1986 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1986APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 050286 SCHPRD CHECK
05/08/1986RECEIVED APPELLANT'S CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/28/1986ORDER DENY MO TO DISMISS; NO 7A; APLT DIR TO CAUSE REC TO BE PREP & TRNSMTD FORTHWITH. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 051386 SCHPRD OPE
11/14/1986ORDER APLTS IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED. (NO RECORD) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072886 SCHPRD R
11/24/1986APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 11/14/86 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RJG PANEL SCDATE 112486 SCHPRD ANSA
12/05/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120486 SCHPRD CHECK
06/01/1987ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE RECORD OR THIS CASE SHALL STAND DIS- MISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 010587 SCHPRD R
06/05/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO JUNE 1ST COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1987ORDER APLT IN 5 DAYS TO FILE RECORD; FAILURE TO COMPLY W/ORDER WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF AP. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 061187 SCHPRD R
08/17/1987RECORD ON APPEAL & (2 ENVELOPES OF EXHIBITS) JB PANEL SCDATE 081187 SCHPRD R
10/23/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT ATTY RONALD A. GOODBREAD PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-08. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 110487 SCHPRD OPE
12/09/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO ENLARGE TIME FOR ADDITIONAL 20 DAYS TO OBTAIN NEW COUNSEL PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/31/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND TIME TO OBTAIN NEW COUNSEL TO JAN 18TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 09-14. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 010688 SCHPRD DDW
01/11/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING SETTLE- MENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/02/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLES TO DISMISS & CASE DISMISSED;MO OF APLT TO OBTAIN COUNSEL DENIED AS MOOT. PANELPY SCDATE 021688 SCHPRD Q
03/02/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -MK CITE FE
03/24/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988LETTER SENT TO APPEALS COORDINATOR & ATTORNEYS RETURNING EXHIBITS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD