Case Information: 42888 | |||
Short Caption: | SHOEMAKER VS. WINCO FOODS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0105941 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/10/2004 / Eisenberg, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Woodburn & Wedge--check no. 070195. | ||
03/04/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-04087 | |
03/05/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 8/30/02 Order and 12/29/03 Order Granting in Part Motion to Retax Costs. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/10/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/10/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, Order Granting in Part and Denying In Part Motion for Summary Judgment filed in district court on 8/30/02; and Order Granting in Part Motion to Retax Cost filed in district court on 12/29/03. | 04-04542 | |
03/16/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. See 03/22/04 docket entry--Filing fee waived/in forma pauperis. | ||
03/16/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-04979 | |
03/16/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Parties are advised to notify this court immediately if a change of designation of parties is desired. | ||
03/16/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/22/2004 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed in district court on March 17, 2004. (Suzanne Shoemaker). | 04-05399 | |
03/23/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Robert Eisenberg. (notice of appeal and district court orders) | ||
04/08/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. | 04-06540 | |
04/21/2004 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 04-07388 | |
04/30/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to file Docketing Statements and Denying Motion to Dismiss. To date, appellant/cross-respondent's ('appellant') and respondent/ cross-appellant's ('respondent') have failed to file their docketing statements. Appellant and respondent shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve their docketing statements. Failure to comply timely may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal and cross-appeal as abandoned. NRAP 14(c). Respondent has moved to dismiss appellant's appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant opposes the motion. We deny respondent's motion. This denial is without prejudice to respondent's right to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement proceedings. | 04-07924 | |
05/04/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 04-08154 | |
05/04/2004 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 04-08155 | |
05/18/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 04-09191 | |
05/18/2004 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |