Case Information: 42858 | |||
Short Caption: | LANGERMANN VS. SHAW | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43209 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A448293 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/27/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/27/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 04-03772 | |
02/27/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/08/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robert Langermann--USPS Money Order # 06290026942. | ||
03/11/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 04-04649 | |
03/19/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Respondent has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. As the notice of appeal was filed before the district court entered a final judgment in the case, the notice was ineffective and failed to vest jurisdiction in this court. Consequently, we grant respondent's motion and " . . . dismiss this appeal." NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-05211 | |
04/13/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-06357 | |
04/13/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/13/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 15, 2004. | 04-06357 |