judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS MURPHY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1467
Short Caption:THOMAS MURPHY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F834-89Filed Date:12/13/1989

Opening Event Date:12/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/05/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/04/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/27/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/25/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThomas Murphy N
John A. Briley, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Steven N. Gersten YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MURPHY, THOMAS UNITED STATES
12/13/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN A. BRILEY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD DSA
01/24/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 020890 SCHPRD V
03/05/1990FiledRecord Completed
03/05/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990RECORD ON APPEAL NO RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 021390 SCHPRD R
04/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 30, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD BA
04/25/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/30/90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 042390 SCHPRD Q
04/30/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD BA
06/04/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/04/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD BE
02/27/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/27/1991SUBMITTED PANELFEWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/25/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD