Case: 02-06-00089-CR
02-06-00089-CR
03/15/2006
Capital Murder
Andrew Wamsley
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||||||
10/14/2008 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||||
10/06/2008 | Order entered | | |||||||
09/10/2008 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||||||
06/13/2008 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||||
05/14/2008 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||||
04/10/2008 | Letter filed | | |||||||
04/07/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
04/07/2008 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||||
03/13/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
11/08/2007 | Submitted | | |||||||
10/25/2007 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||||
10/16/2007 | Letter from Attorneys Waiving Oral Argument | | |||||||
10/15/2007 | Letter from Attorneys Waiving Oral Argument | | |||||||
09/13/2007 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |||||||
09/13/2007 | Motion for Leave Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
09/13/2007 | Motion for Leave Filed | | |||||||
09/06/2007 | Submission | | |||||||
09/06/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
09/06/2007 | Brief Filed | | |||||||
09/06/2007 | Motion for Leave Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
09/04/2007 | Motion for Leave Filed | | |||||||
09/04/2007 | Brief Received, Not Filed | | |||||||
08/21/2007 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
08/20/2007 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||||
06/21/2007 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
06/20/2007 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||||
05/21/2007 | Brief Filed | | |||||||
05/07/2007 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
05/07/2007 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||||
04/25/2007 | Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed | | |||||||
03/20/2007 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
03/19/2007 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||||
01/19/2007 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
01/18/2007 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||||
10/20/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
10/19/2006 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |||||||
09/19/2006 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||||
08/31/2006 | Request for Extension of Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
08/30/2006 | Received Reporter's Record Affidavit or Letter | | |||||||
07/06/2006 | Request for Extension of Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
07/05/2006 | Received Reporter's Record Affidavit or Letter | | |||||||
07/03/2006 | Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed | | |||||||
07/03/2006 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||||
04/11/2006 | Motion For New Trial Filed in Trial Court | | |||||||
03/29/2006 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||||
03/15/2006 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/20/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Wamsley, Andrew | Criminal - Appellant | David A. Pearson, IV |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles M. Mallin |
Trial Court Information
297th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Leo Everett Young
0929235A
Ct. 1 LIFE IDTDCJ