judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHINGLETON (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34780
Short Caption:SHINGLETON (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34892 , 37218
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154463Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08360
09/24/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Clarence E. Gamble shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-09124
04/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-05490
05/05/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. Appellant was represented on appeal by Clarence E. Gamble. On April 13, 2000, this court entered an order suspending Gamble from the practice of law. Gamble is relieved of any further obligation with respect to this appeal. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, district court shall order that within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. District court clerk: 5 days to transmit district court order to this court and serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Counsel: 10 days to enter appearance. fn1[All filing deadlines shall run from the date on which counsel enters an appearance with this court.] (Mailed copy of order to attorney Gamble by regular and certified mail). 00-07437
07/11/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, district court shall order that within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to enter an appearance with the clerk of this court. fn1[All filing deadlines set forth in NRAP 3C shall commence to run from the date on which counsel enters an appearance in this court.] 00-11839
08/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. On June 16, 2000, the district court appointed Robert M. Draskovich, Jr., to represent appellant. Draskovich shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to supplement appellant's proper person request to dismiss this appeal with an affidavit. The briefing schedule for this case is suspended pending further order of this court. 00-13869
08/21/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Robert M. Draskovich. 00-14619
09/21/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On July 14, 2000, this court received a proper person notice from appellant requesting that this appeal be dismissed. On August 21, 2000, counsel for appellant filed an affidavit informing this court that he has informed appellant of the legal effects and consequences of voluntarily withdrawing this appeal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-16660
09/21/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.