Case Information: 10-FM-0883 | |||
Short Caption: | KAREN CLEAVER-BASCOMBE V. KIMMO KARTANO | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Other Family |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DRB2599-04 | Filed Date: | 07/16/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/16/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/02/2010 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Karen Cleaver-Bascombe | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | Kimmo Kartano | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
07/16/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
07/16/2010 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY of order pending appeal (trial court order dated July 6, 2010) | |||
07/26/2010 | ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). It is ****MORE***** | |||
07/26/2010 | FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's MOTION FOR STAY IS HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of the court. (BY: ETW) | |||
07/26/2010 | TMC - OTSC - appellant's motion for stay (IN ABEYANCE) - ROTSC | |||
08/16/2010 | RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated 7/26/10 | |||
10/08/2010 | ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER... It is *****MORE***** | |||
10/08/2010 | FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MTOION FOR STAY IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is (RZGLNB) (jl) | |||
10/08/2010 | DISMISSED | |||
11/02/2010 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
04/17/2014 | Filed | Archived |