judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM CHURCH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-158)
Case Number:06-158Case Docketed On:07/07/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:WILLIAM CHURCH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WILLIAM CHURCH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam ChurchKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/07/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/23/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/24/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/31/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with wavier (faxed)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
09/01/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
09/01/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal