judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL. v. E. A. SCHLICK, ET AL.

Case: A-2
A-2
01/01/1944
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
E. A. SCHLICK, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/06/1944Reply to ResponseRespondent
03/01/1944Response to Brief filedPetitioner
02/21/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/10/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
01/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/1944Returned document(s). See Remarks.
03/06/1944Reply to Response
03/01/1944Response to Brief filed
02/21/1944Supplemental Brief filed
01/24/1944Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
01/24/1944Letter Filed
01/19/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/19/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/19/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/10/1944Response to Petition
01/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of Texas, et al.Petitioner
E. A. Schlick, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information