Case Information: 42892 | |||
Short Caption: | LOPEZ (ROBERTO) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0101005C | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/04/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 04-04128 | |
03/08/2004 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: November 12, 2003. Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. | 04-04383 | |
04/09/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 04-06627 | |
04/09/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. | 04-06628 | |
04/26/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in Which to file Respondent's Fast Track Statement. | 04-07648 | |
04/29/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed April 26, 2004. Counsel for respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. | 04-07852 | |
05/13/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 04-08952 | |
08/18/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-14954 | |
09/14/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-14990 | |
09/14/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/20/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 15, 2004. | 04-14990 |