judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF GRISWOLD

Case Information: 42856
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF GRISWOLDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - PRGU03142Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/05/2004 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/22/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/27/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robert Kilby--check no. 1005.
02/27/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-03742
03/05/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/10/2004Other Returned Unfiled Document.
03/10/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 12, 2004. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 04-04536
03/18/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-05158
08/05/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 31, 2004. 04-14159
10/20/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. 04-19348
12/06/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 04-22175
12/15/2004Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. On March 10, 2004, during the pendency of the settlement proceedings, court reporter Tom Mercer filed a certified copy of a transcript for proceedings conducted on January 12, 2004. In the event appellant intends to cite to transcripts in addition to the one filed by court reporter Mercer, appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file and serve a transcript request form in compliance with NRAP 9(a). In the event no additional transcripts are necessary for this court's review of this appeal, appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file a certificate of no transcript request. Because this is a child custody matter, appellant shall have 90 days form the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days from service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days from service of the answering brief to file and serve the reply brief if deemed necessary. See NRAP 31(a)(2). 04-22852
12/29/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 04-23682
03/15/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-05063
03/15/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 05-05065
04/14/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Child Custody Answering Brief.
04/15/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Child Custody Answering Brief. Corrected Notice.
04/27/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-08277
04/28/2005BriefReceived Answering Brief. 05-08354
04/28/2005AppendixReceived Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-08355
05/09/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed April 27, 2005. The clerk shall file the answering brief and appendix received on April 28, 2005. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. 05-08981
05/09/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-08354
05/09/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-08355
05/31/2005Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
08/15/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: January 23, 2004. Court Reporter: Liz Fetterman. 05-16124
11/04/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. William E. Schaeffer. 05-21832
11/15/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Non-Opposition to William E. Schaeffers' Withdraw as Attorney of Record. 05-22400
12/14/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Respondent's Attorney's Withdrawal. 05-24369
12/22/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 05-24923
12/22/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP06R-MD/RR/RP
01/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to Withdraw. We elect to treat the document filed by Mr. Shaeffer on November 4, 2005, as a motion to withdraw as respondent's counsel. We deny the motion. Mr. Shaeffer shall remain respondent's counsel of record. 06-00420
02/15/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06R-RR/MD/RP 06-03305
03/14/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04276
03/14/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/24/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 16, 2006. 06-04276