judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ABDUL RAHMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1463
Short Caption:ABDUL RAHMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12754-77Filed Date:12/21/1989

Opening Event Date:12/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/16/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAbdul Rahman N
Barbara L. Smith NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RAHMAN, ABDUL ET AL UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/28/90 ORD: DENYING MO TO NOTE - 01 DISMISS W/OUT PREJ TO RENEWAL NOTE - 02 W/IN 20 DAYS IF APLT SUBMITS A NOTE - 02 STMT IN ACCORDANCE WITH NOTE - 03 JOHNSON V. U.S. NOTE - 03
12/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/21/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990$50.00 DOCKETING FEE AD PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD PDDA
02/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD TO
04/17/1990RECEIVED STMT OF APLT IN 89-1463 IN ACCORDANCE WITH JOHNSON V. US. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/07/1990STATEMENT OF APLT IN 89-1542 IN ACCORDANCE WITH JOHNSON V US AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/08/1990ORDER GRANTING APLT'S MO TO DISMISS; DISMISSING APPEAL. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/16/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD