judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARVIN D. WILSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1459
Short Caption:MARVIN D. WILSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14164-88Filed Date:12/07/1989

Opening Event Date:12/07/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/18/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/08/1991
Argued/Submitted:11/14/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarvin D. Wilson N
Peter N. MannYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Peter R. ZeidenbergYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILSON, MARVIN D. UNITED STATES
12/07/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER N. MANN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1990RECEIVED OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD DSA
02/26/1990RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSCRIPT 175-FINNERIN AJ PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD R
03/05/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR GLEASON CERTIFICATION OF 11/9/88 PROCEEDING (CASE NOT ON CALENDAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (18 PGS. -- HART) RJG PANEL SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD RT
03/07/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV & DSA IS FL; BRF OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE RECORD. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 022290 SCHPRD V
04/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(12 PGS/BOSTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1990FiledRecord Completed
05/18/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (152 PGS. -- BURNS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 052690 SCHPRD RT
06/27/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 062790 SCHPRD BA
10/01/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD U
01/09/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (180-PGS/FARMER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 121790 SCHPRD RT
01/22/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 012191 SCHPRD X
03/01/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO (?) AD PANEL SCDATE 030491 SCHPRD BA
03/27/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE ON OR BEFORE 4/1/91 (NFX) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 032291 SCHPRD TO
04/01/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/3/91 PMB PANEL SCDATE 040191 SCHPRD BA
04/03/1991RECEIVED APPELLANTS BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1991ORDER GRANT MO FO APLT FOR EXT TM TO FL BRF; BA FILED. BE DUE 5/17/91 AD PANEL SCDATE 041691 SCHPRD K
05/08/1991FiledBriefing Completed
05/08/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 051791 SCHPRD BE
11/14/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/14/1991SUBMITTED PANELSTKGNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTKGNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE