judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HOWARD L. CLEMENTS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1489
Short Caption:HOWARD L. CLEMENTS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3558-89Filed Date:12/21/1989

Opening Event Date:12/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/21/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/03/1991
Argued/Submitted:11/07/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/02/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHoward L. Clements N
John C. Krollman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Teresa A. Howie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CLEMENTS, HOWARD L. UNITED STATES
12/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN C. KROLLMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD DSA
02/27/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) RJG PANEL SCDATE 021990 SCHPRD R
03/09/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 030290 SCHPRD V
05/21/1990FiledRecord Completed
05/21/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (272 PGS - MILLER) PF PANEL SCDATE 051190 SCHPRD RT
07/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 60 DAYS PAST PRESENT DUE DATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 070290 SCHPRD BA
07/27/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 08-27-90. NFX. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD GR
04/19/1991ORDER DIR. APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE DISMISSED. AD PANELRO SCDATE 082790 SCHPRD BA
04/29/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 042991 SCHPRD BA
05/06/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 ORDER OF J. DIXON DATED 4/22/91 PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1991FiledBriefing Completed
06/03/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 060391 SCHPRD BE
11/07/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/07/1991SUBMITTED PANELFAKGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFAKGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/02/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD