judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EMANUEL NICKS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1488
Short Caption:EMANUEL NICKS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8859-88Filed Date:12/21/1989

Opening Event Date:12/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/11/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/19/1991
Argued/Submitted:03/06/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/19/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEmanuel Nicks N
David H. StringerYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Maritn D. Carpenter YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NICKS, EMANUEL UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/14/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 ON 11/2/90; BRF OF APLE DUE ON NOTE - 02 12/7/90; REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 02 ON 12/26/90; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 03 FEB. 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 11/9/90 ORD: 9/14/90 ORD NOTE - 04 VACATED; GRANT MO OF APLT TO NOTE - 05 EXT TM TO FL BRF BY 12/3/90; NOTE - 05 BRF OF APLE DUE BY 1/2/91, NOTE - 06 REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE BY NOTE - 06 1/22/91; SCHED CASE ON MARCH NOTE - 07 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 12/10/90 ORD: THIS CRT'S NOTE - 08 ADVANCED BRFG ORD OF 11/9/90, NOTE - 09 IS HEREBY VAC. F/O APLT MO FOR NOTE - 09 EXT OF TM IS GRANTD & BRF OF NOTE - 10 APLT TO BE FILED NO LATER THAN NOTE - 10 12/10/90, BRF OF APLE TO BE NOTE - 11 FL NO LATER THAN 1/9/91, & NOTE - 11 REPLY BRF OF APLT, IF ANY, TO NOTE - 12 BE FILED NO LATER THAN 1/28/91 NOTE - 12 F/O THAT THIS CASE TO REMAIN NOTE - 13 SCHD FOR CONSI ON 3/91 CAL. AS NOTE - 13 THESE DATE HAVE BEEN SET TO NOTE - 14 ENABLE CRT TO SCHD THIS CASE NOTE - 14 ON THIS CAL; F/O NFX.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/03/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - STRINGERD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CARPENTERM FOR - APPELLEE
12/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID H. STRINGER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD DSA
01/30/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (119 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 021990 SCHPRD R
02/02/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (171 PGS. -- FRANKLIN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(127 PGS/JANIFER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (337-PGS/WHALEN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 030190 SCHPRD RT
05/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(35 PGS/GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(23 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/11/1990FiledRecord Completed
06/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (115-PGS/FARMER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. FOR ADVANCE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. JJ PANELFF SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD B
11/01/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-3-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 110290 SCHPRD BA
11/09/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-07. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 091490 SCHPRD CHECK
12/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-10-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 120390 SCHPRD BA
12/10/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 121090 SCHPRD BA
12/10/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 THRU 14 GW PANELRO SCDATE 120790 SCHPRD TO
12/31/1990LETTER OF APLT RE: CASE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 010991 SCHPRD BE
01/10/1991RECEIVED BRIEF OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1991FiledBriefing Completed
01/19/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1991ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE FOR LV TO FL BRF & BRF OF APLE IS FL. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/06/1991ARGUED PANELTEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/19/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD