Case Information: 42870 | |||
Short Caption: | THOMAS (WALTER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34123 , 44341 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C145031 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/02/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/02/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 04-03952 | |
03/02/2004 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: January 9, 2004. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. Filed in district court on: February 25, 2004. | 04-03953 | |
04/07/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 04-06427 | |
04/13/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed April 7, 2004. The rough draft transcript requests were filed in the district court on February 25, 2004, and the requested transcripts are overdue. Court reporter or recorder Janie Olsen shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order. The motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellant shall have 30 days from the filing of the transcripts within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 04-06760 | |
05/10/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 04-08658 | |
05/10/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. | 04-08660 | |
05/26/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 04-09716 | |
09/07/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-16187 | |
10/05/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-16495 | |
10/05/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/21/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 8, 2004. | 04-16495 |