judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLINT A. TURNER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1483
Short Caption:CLINT A. TURNER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14709-88Filed Date:12/15/1989

Opening Event Date:12/15/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/05/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/05/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/21/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/15/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClint A. Turner N
Paul H. ZukerbergYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TURNER, CLINT A. UNITED STATES
12/15/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PAUL H. ZUKERBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990FiledRecord Completed
03/05/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 021990 SCHPRD R
04/24/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT TO FILE DOCKETING STATE W/IN 10 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD DSA
04/30/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD DSA
05/30/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS. NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO WI/IN 30 DYS FRM THE DATE OF THIS ORD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD GR
08/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO FL BRF & LODGED BRF IS FILED; F/O BRF OF APLE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 083190 SCHPRD V
09/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(267 PGS/MILLER) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/05/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 100890 SCHPRD BE
10/16/1990RECEIVED SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/21/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1991SUBMITTED PANELFEWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/15/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD