judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRANT (AUBREY) VS. STATE C/W 42933

Case Information: 42869
Short Caption:GRANT (AUBREY) VS. STATE C/W 42933Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:42869*, 42933 Related Case(s): 42407 , 42933 , 49012 , 51489 , 62376 , 64431
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C192433Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/14/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/02/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/02/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 04-03949
03/02/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-03976
03/12/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-04717
03/19/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. Prawalsky requested an additional 45 days to file the transcript in this appeal. Prawalsky shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the transcript. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcript to file the fast track statement and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 3C. 04-05295
04/19/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/10/03, 11/12/03, 11/13/03, 1/27/04, 2/10/04, 3/16/04. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 04-07144
05/06/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-08405
05/11/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed May 6, 2004. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 04-08797
06/01/2004MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 17 Page Fast Track Statement. 04-10062
06/01/2004Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 04-10064
06/10/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed June 1, 2004. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the 17-page fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on June 1, 2004. 04-10774
06/10/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-10064
06/10/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-10065
07/06/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-12181
09/14/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 19, 2004, certified copies of the transcripts of the jury trial and sentencing hearings were filed by court reporter Shirlee Prawalsky. The record indicates that on November 10, 2003, eyewitnesses Rodolfo Sanchez, Juan Gonzalez, and Thomas Albert testified at trial. To date, this court has not received a copy of the transcripts of that witness testimony. Accordingly, the court reporter shall deliver a copy of the requested transcripts to the clerk of this court within ten (10) days from the date of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. 04-16809
11/16/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 14, 2004, this court ordered court reporter Shirlee Prawalsky to file the transcripts of the November 10, 2003, trial testimony of eyewitnesses Rodolfo Sanchez, Juan Gonzalez, and Thomas Albert within 10 days or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. However, as of this date, Prawalsky has neither filed a copy of the transcripts with this court or shown cause why she should not be sanctioned as required by this court's September 14, 2004, order and NRAP 3C(d)(3)(iii). Accordingly, Prawalsky shall file the transcripts with the clerk of this court within 10 days of this date of this order or shall personally pay to the Supreme Court Law Library sanctions in the amount of one hundred dollars ($100.00) and provide proof of payment to the clerk of this court within 20 days of the date of this order. 04-21059
12/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. we have elected to consolidate these appeals for disposition. In Docket No. 42933, the transcript filed of the November 10, 2003, proceeding was incomplete. Upon further review of this matter, it appears that Shirlee Prawalsky may not have been the court reporter during the time that the witnesses at issue testified. Accordingly, Prawalsky shall have ten days from the date of this order to file the missing portion of the November 10, 2003, transcript or inform this court that she was not the court reporter for that portion of the proceeding. Fn1--[ In No. 42869, counsel has not filed a copy of a rough draft transcript request form in this court as required by NRAP 3C(d)(3). Nonetheless, because the trial transcripts were filed in Docket No. 42933, counsel need not file the rough draft transcript request. Counsel for appellant is cautioned, however, that continued failure to file copies of the rough draft transcript request forms in this court may result in the imposition of sanctions. Nos. 42869/42933 04-23305
01/04/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: November 10, 2003. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. Nos. 42869/42933. (05-00157) (filed in case no. 42869 only) 05-00157
01/12/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. These are consolidated appeals pursuant to jury verdicts. This court has concluded that full briefing of these appeals is warranted. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, the party must file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening briefs. fn2[We note that certified copies of the transcripts have been filed in these cases. But should counsel cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a). If the necessary transcripts have already been prepared and are on filed in the district court, the parties may include such transcripts in a supplemental appendix without filing a transcript request form.] Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 31. Nos. 42869/ 42933. (05-00684) 05-00684
02/15/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant Grant. Nos. 42869/42933. 05-02998
02/15/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant Ward. Nos. 42869/42933. 05-03010
02/15/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant Ward. Nos. 42869/42933. 05-03011
03/15/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 13, 2005. Nos. 42869/42933. 05-05106
03/15/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 13, 2005. Nos. 42869/42933 05-05113
04/15/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. in 42933. Nos. 42869/42933. 05-07392
05/05/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. in 42933. Nos. 42869/42933. (05-07392) 05-08831
07/14/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and these appeals shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 42869/42933. (05-14017) 05-14017
07/14/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Nos. 42869/42933.
09/23/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH. Nos. 42869/42933 05-18970
10/19/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-19242
10/19/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/26/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 21, 2005. 05-19242