judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES E. HARRIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1482
Short Caption:JAMES E. HARRIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2784-89Filed Date:12/18/1989

Opening Event Date:12/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/13/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/17/1991
Argued/Submitted:02/27/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/11/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames E. Harris N
Veronice A. HoltYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Frederick W. Yette NN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARRIS, JAMES E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902 TO MLSME FILED 3/2/92
01/01/1905TRDATE- 92/02/27 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HOLTV FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - YETTEF FOR - APPELLEE
12/18/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) VERONICE A. HOLT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (111 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 052190 SCHPRD RT
04/26/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (250-PGS/BURNS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 052290 SCHPRD RT
05/03/1990ORDER APPELLANT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DOCKETING STATE W/IN 10 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD DSA
05/14/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD DSA
06/13/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (12-PGS/HAWKINS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 052490 SCHPRD RT
06/13/1990RECORD COMPLETED
06/19/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 062390 SCHPRD CHECK
04/19/1991ORDER DIR. APLT TO FL BRF W/IN 10 DAY OR CASE DISMISSED. AD PANELRO SCDATE 081990 SCHPRD BA
04/29/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/4/91 AJ PANEL SCDATE 042991 SCHPRD BA
05/07/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/10/91 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1991ORDER GR APLT MO FOR EXT TM FL BRF, BA FILED. BE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 051491 SCHPRD K
06/17/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 061791 SCHPRD BE
06/17/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/27/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/27/1992ARGUED PANELFESCFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1992APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMOAND FOR BRIEFING SCHD PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1992Grant appellee's motion for leave to file supplemental briefs and for a briefing schedule and there appearing to be no opposition thereto. Appellee shall file, within 20 days from the date of this order a supplemental brief directed at the issue of whether and to what extent James Martin retained his privilege against self-incrimination at the of his trial testimony in light of his prior testimonyat the pretrial sumpression hearing. Appellant shall have 20 days thereafter to file a supplementalbrief (FESCFA)
04/08/1992APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMO UNTIL 4/15/92.
04/21/1992APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMO
04/21/1992APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM
05/07/1992APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM
05/07/1992ORD GRT APLE MO FOR LV TO FL SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO
06/01/1992appellant's motion to extend time for filing brief
06/09/1992Grant appellant's motion to extend time for filingbrief, to and including June 18, 1992, and there being no opposition thereto.
06/26/1992RECEIVED - supplemental brief for appellant
07/01/1992APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEto Government's supplemental brief to 6/26/92.
07/08/1992appellant's motion to extend time for filing briefand the lodged supplemental brief
08/05/1992ORDER-Grant appellant's motion to extend time for filing brief, and the lodged supplemental brief (FESCFA)
08/05/1992APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF is filed
08/21/1992AFFIRMED Judgment AF judgment of the trial court (FE SC FA)
09/11/1992MANDATE ISSUED