judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STANLEY SIMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1470
Short Caption:STANLEY SIMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F153-88Filed Date:12/14/1989

Opening Event Date:12/14/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/09/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/06/1992
Argued/Submitted:06/09/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/25/1994

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStanley Simpson N
James W. KleinNY
Stephen I. Singer NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth H. DanelloNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SIMPSON, STANLEY UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND/REG
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 8/9/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 9/24/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 02 10/28/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 02 11/18/91; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 03 JANUARY 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 11/5/91 ORD: GR MO OF APLT FR NOTE - 04 LV TO FL (CORRECTED) BRF; NOTE - 05 LDGD (CORRECTED) BRF IS FILED; NOTE - 05 BRF OF APLE DUE 12/6/91.
12/14/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/02/1990ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD DSA
03/05/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 021490 SCHPRD R
03/19/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (160 PGS. -- GOAD) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040490 SCHPRD RT
04/04/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 040390 SCHPRD BA
04/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(126 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/07/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION CRT RPTR JACKSON TO EXT TIME TO FILE 9/25/89 THRU 9/27/89 PROC TO JUNE 31ST JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 042090 SCHPRD U
05/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(507 PGS/HUNT) AD PANEL SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD RT
05/17/1990ORDER GRANT RPTR JACKSON EXTENSION TO FILE 9/25/89 - 9/27/89 PROC RT DUE BY 6/31/90 (NFX) JB PANELRO SCDATE 051990 SCHPRD RT
05/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(128 PGS/LEWIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 052090 SCHPRD RT
05/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(433 PGS/MITCHELL) AD PANEL SCDATE 051790 SCHPRD RT
05/29/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR LEWIS CERTIFICATION OF 10/5/90 PROC (CASE TAPE RECORDED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (200 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD RT
06/28/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CT RPTR LEWIS TO EXT TIME TO FILE 10/2/89 - 10/5/89 RT TO AUGUST 31ST JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(126 PGS/JACKSON) AD PANEL SCDATE 063090 SCHPRD RT
07/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (70 PGS.--JACKSON) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1990ORDER GRANT CT RPTR LEWIS' MOTION TO EXT, 10/2/89 - 10/5/89 PROC DUE BY AUGUST 31ST (NFX) JB PANELRO SCDATE 052190 SCHPRD RT
08/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (24-PGS/EDLEY) AJ PANEL SCDATE 083190 SCHPRD RT
10/09/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9(712 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1990RECORD COMPLETED
08/09/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03 FOR ADVANCE BRIEFING SCHEDULE GR PANELJAC SCDATE 080891 SCHPRD GR
09/24/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 4, 1991 RJG PANEL SCDATE 092491 SCHPRD BA
10/07/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/17/91 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 5 DAYS; 8/9/91 ORD IS VACATED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 100991 SCHPRD TT
10/28/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 102891 SCHPRD BA
10/29/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF CORRECTED BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S CORRECTED BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/05/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF (CORRECTED). EVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/05/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-05. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 111191 SCHPRD OPE
11/25/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS PMB PANEL SCDATE 120691 SCHPRD BE
12/09/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #10 (24 PGS. - EDLEY) (10/5/89 PROC.) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1991ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 1/6/91. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 121191 SCHPRD B
01/06/1992APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 010692 SCHPRD BE
01/06/1992BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/19/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
05/19/1992RECEIVED appellants reply brief.
06/01/1992appellant's motion for leave to file attached reply brief
06/05/1992CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
06/08/1992grant aplt's unopposed motion for leave to file attached reply brief
06/08/1992APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF is filed
06/08/1992Transmitting to division correspondence received from appelee pursuant to Rule 28 (k)
06/09/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/09/1992ARGUED TE SU MK Stephen I. Singer, Esq. for appellant; John R. Fisher, Esq. for appellee.
10/04/1993REVERSED Opinion
10/18/1993APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EB until 11/1/93. (no oppo.)
10/19/1993ORD GRT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB on or before November 1, 1993. (RO)
11/01/1993APLE'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC
02/01/1994ORDER directing appellant within 20 days from the date of this order shall file a response to pet. for reh/reh en banc (10 copies). (RO)
02/22/1994APPELLANT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITIONto appellee's petition for rehearing or, in the alternative, rehearing en banc.
02/28/1994ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION to pet for reh/reh en banc on or before 3/17/94. (RO)
03/16/1994APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to appellee's petition for rehearing or, in the alternative, rehearing en banc.
04/15/1994ORDER DENY APPELLEE'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (Judge Ferren was an Associate Judge of this court at the time of argument. His status changed to Acting Chief Judge on March 18, 1994. Judge Farrell is recused from this case.) (EB)
04/25/1994MANDATE ISSUED