judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AMAZON.COM VS. MAGEE

Case Information: 42860
Short Caption:AMAZON.COM VS. MAGEECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0201165AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/09/2004 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/24/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/01/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Santoro, Driggs, Walch, Kearney, Johnson & Thompson--check no. 4948.
03/01/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-03824
03/09/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/15/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-04783
03/17/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. David Wasick. (docketing statement)
03/24/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge recommends that this appeal be removed from the Settlement Conference program. 04-05533
04/22/2004Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. Pursuant to the written request of the settlement judge and good cause appearing, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Accordingly, we reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 04-07424
05/04/2004Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 5879 in the amount of $250 returned to Santoro, Driggs law firm. (Filing fee previously paid.)
05/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. 04-08146
07/06/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Comply with NRAP 9(a). To date appellant has failed to comply with our order of April 22, 2004. We again direct appellant to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the appropriate document. 04-12207
07/12/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 04-12605
08/24/2004MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 20, 2004. 04-15320
09/16/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-17039
09/20/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Karyn Taylor of Littler Mendelson in place and stead of Javier Arguello of Santoro Driggs firm as counsel for appellant. 04-17419
09/21/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-17493
09/21/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 04-17494
09/23/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On September 16, 2004, appellant filed a motion requesting a second extension of time to file the opening brief. On September 21, 2004, appellant timely filed its opening brief and appendix. Accordingly, we deny the motion as moot. 04-17623
10/20/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-19363
11/24/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-21608
05/24/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. NRAP 34(f)(1). 05-10224
05/24/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/22/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before Maupin, Douglas and Parraguirre, JJ. Author: Douglas, J. We concur: Maupin and Parraguirre, JJ. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 63. NNP05/Maupin/Douglas/Parraguirre. 05-18808
10/04/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-19690
10/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's petition for rehearing due: October 28, 2005. 05-19909
10/25/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Kinney & Levinson--check no. 4919.
10/25/2005Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 05-21117
11/15/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. To the Publishers from Cay Jordan, Editor. Correction on page 2 of the original opinion filed September 22, 2005.
01/11/2006Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP05-WM/MD/RP 06-00795
02/07/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-01342
02/07/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/02/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 8, 2006. 06-01342