judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VAUN THOMAS, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1451
Short Caption:VAUN THOMAS, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14632-88Filed Date:09/05/1989

Opening Event Date:09/05/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/30/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVaun Thomas, Jr.N
Allen H. Orenberg NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMAS JR., VAUN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/8/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE BY NOTE - 01 6/26/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 02 7/31/91 & REPLY BRF OF APLT, NOTE - 02 IF ANY, DUE BY 8/19/91; SCHED NOTE - 03 CASE ON OCTOBER 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 03
09/05/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALLEN H. ORENBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD DSA
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (217 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 020690 SCHPRD RT
05/08/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 042391 SCHPRD B
05/17/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (54 PGS. -- SIMMS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1991ORDER APLT TO FL BRF W/IN 10 DAYS OR COUNSEL NAME REMOVED FROM CJA LIST. AD PANELRO SCDATE 070291 SCHPRD K
07/11/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1991ORDER MO OF APLT TO W/DRAW APPEAL DENIED W/OUT PREJ TO FILING IN 10 JOHNSON STATEMENT. AD PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATE IN ACCORD.W/JOHNSON V U.S., ETC. RJG PANEL SCDATE 080191 SCHPRD STATE
09/06/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
09/06/1991ORDER MO OF APLT TO DISMISS APPEAL IS GRANTED. PANELRO SCDATE 081491 SCHPRD K
09/06/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
09/30/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD