Case Information: 42851 | |||
Short Caption: | MOJICA-FERNANDEZ (JUAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C193921 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/26/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/26/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 04-03711 | |
04/05/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM | 04-06162 | |
04/30/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-07077 | |
04/30/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/13/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 4, 2004. | 04-07077 |