judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NELSON (VERNON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42872
Short Caption:NELSON (VERNON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51002 , 67297 , 68158
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C181592Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/09/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/02/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/02/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-03956
03/02/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: January 28, 2004, November 3, 2003, October 22-23, 2003, July 28, 2003, July 7, 2003, October 9, 2002, September 25, 2002, August 7, 2002, May 22, 2002, March 13, 2002 and February 25, 2002. To Court Reporter: Kris Cornelius. 04-03957
03/12/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-04739
03/16/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed March 12, 2004. Court recorder Janice R. Liston shall have until May 17, 2004, to file and serve the requested transcripts. 04-04984
03/18/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-05163
03/29/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 3/24/04 Judgment of Conviction. Due Date: 10 days
04/05/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on March 24, 2004. 04-06224
05/13/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/25/02, 3/13/02, 8/7/02, 9/25/02, 10/9/02, 7/7/03, 7/23/03, 10/22/03, 10/23/03, 10/24/03, 10/27/03, 10/28/03, 10/29/03, 11/3/03 and 1/28/04. Court Reporter: Janice R. Liston. 04-08980
05/13/2004Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Recorder Janice R. Liston. The May 22, 2002, transcript was previously transcribed prior to the appeal, and the July 20, 2003, requested date should be July 23, 2003. 04-09098
06/07/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/21/02, 06/11/03, 10/01/03, 10/06/03, and 10/13/03. To Court Reporter: Kris Cornelius 04-10505
06/08/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. On May 13, 2004, Ms. Liston filed several of the requested transcripts for this appeal and a letter advising this court on the status of two other transcripts. Our review of the district court's docket entries indicates that the requested transcript for proceedings conducted on May 22, 2002, was filed in the district court on October 16, 2002, prior to the docketing of this appeal. Accordingly, appellant improperly requested the production of this transcript. If appellant intends to cite to the May 22, 2002, transcript, he shall include a file-stamped copy of the transcript in the appendix. Ms. Liston is not obligated to prepare and file the May 22, 2002, transcript. We note that appellant did not request transcripts for proceedings conducted on either July 20, 2003, or July 23, 2003. Instead, appellant identified several of the transcripts to be produced and also improperly requested transcripts for 'any all other hearings.' Nevertheless, because Ms. Liston has prepared and filed a transcript for proceedings conducted on July 23, 2003, the parties may refer to it in their briefs. 04-10573
06/29/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 60 days requested. 04-11978
07/01/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 08/21/02; 06/11/03; 10/01/03; and 10/13/03. Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius. 04-12130
07/09/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/06/03. Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius. 04-12543
07/28/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed June 29, 2004. Appellant shall have until August 30, 2004, to file and serve the opening brief. No further extensions of time to file the opening brief shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. 04-13717
09/02/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-15985
09/02/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 04-15986
10/05/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-18380
11/08/2004MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 6, 2004. 04-20545
12/09/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-22494
12/16/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Transcript. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] To date, court recorder Kris Cornelius has not filed the requested transcript for proceedings conducted on July 28, 2003. Ms. Cornelius shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcript for proceedings. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcript, Ms. Cornelius shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Ms. Cornelius shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 04-22958
12/27/2004Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Jo Anne Pierpont. There were no proceedings held on July 28, 2003. 04-23452
04/01/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcript. Because Ms. Cornelius did not file the requested transcript for proceedings conducted on July 28, 2003, on December 16, 2004, this court entered an order directing her to file the transcript within 20 days. In response, court recorder Jo Anne B. Pierpont filed a letter stating that no proceedings were conducted on July 28, 2003. Our review of the district court minutes indicates that Ms. Pierpont is correct. Accordingly, this court has received all the requested transcripts necessary for resolution of this appeal. 05-06408
04/15/2005Other Returned Mail. Order filed 04/01/05 addressed to Jo Anne Pierpont (Court Reporter) returned. No forwarding address.
04/18/2005Other Returned Mail. Order filed 04/01/05 addressed to Jo Anne Pierpont (Court Reporter) remailed to same address.
06/09/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 05-11389
06/09/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. NNP05-WM/MD/RP
07/11/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-13647
08/05/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-13834
08/05/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/12/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 8, 2005. 05-13834