judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JULIAN M. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1490
Short Caption:JULIAN M. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6280-89Filed Date:12/21/1989

Opening Event Date:12/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/08/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/01/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/15/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/25/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJulian M. Johnson N
Suzanne D. Sager YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Rene Y. Webb YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, JULIAN M. UNITED STATES
12/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/29/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SUZANNE D. SAGER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AD PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD DSA
01/11/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 012690 SCHPRD V
03/08/1990FiledRecord Completed
03/08/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (6 PGS/FINNERIN) AD PANEL SCDATE 021990 SCHPRD R
04/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 17,1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 041790 SCHPRD BA
05/17/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL LODGED & BRF OF APLE SHALL BE FL W/IN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD B
07/02/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF TO 8-1-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 070290 SCHPRD BE
07/27/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 080190. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 072090 SCHPRD B
08/01/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/01/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 080190 SCHPRD BE
01/15/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/15/1991SUBMITTED PANELSCWGKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/04/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSCWGKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/04/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/25/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD