judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY R. HANNON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1395
Short Caption:ANTHONY R. HANNON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2414-83Filed Date:11/06/1989

Opening Event Date:11/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/10/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony R. Hannon NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HANNON, ANTHONY R. UNITED STATES
11/06/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/15/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 010590 SCHPRD R
05/25/1990ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE HIS BRIEF W/ IN 10 DAYS OR APPEAL TO BE DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/14/1990ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH 5/25/90 ORDER. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/10/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD