Case Information: 44834 | |||
Short Caption: | CROPPER (STEVEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49108 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010673 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/09/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/09/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 05-04647 | |
04/12/2005 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 25, 2005. | 05-07117 | |
04/22/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Joint Motion/Stipulation for Extension of Time in Which to File Fast Track Statement. | 05-07958 | |
04/27/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant is ordered to file 2 copies of the rough draft transcript request form and proof of service in this court within 10 days of this order. Appellant's motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts to file the fast track statement and appendix. | 05-08278 | |
05/04/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 09/17/04. Court Reporter: Peggy Hoogs & Associates. Filed in district court on: 04/13/05. | 05-08794 | |
05/17/2005 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 09/07/04. Court Reporter: Becky Van Auken. | 05-09649 | |
06/02/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 05-10797 | |
06/02/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 05-10798 | |
06/08/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 15 pages. (Fast Track Response). | 05-11289 | |
06/08/2005 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 05-11291 | |
10/24/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP | 05-20964 | |
11/18/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 05-21842 | |
11/18/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/08/2005 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by Washoe District Court Clerk on November 30, 2005. | 05-21842 |