judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARRYL L. ALLEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1458
Short Caption:DARRYL L. ALLEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6226-87Filed Date:12/04/1989

Opening Event Date:12/04/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/18/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/24/1991
Argued/Submitted:11/13/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarryl L. Allen N
David Rosenthal YN
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
David Rosenthal YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Robin C. Ashton YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALLEN, DARRYL L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/18/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF CNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF JAMES KLEIN & APPT DAVID NOTE - 02 ROSENTHAL FOR APLT; FORMER NOTE - 03 COUNSEL TO TRANSMIT ALL DOC- NOTE - 03 UMENTS TO NEWLY APPTD COUNSEL NOTE - 04 FORTHWITH; BRF OF APLT DUE IN NOTE - 04 40 DAYS.
01/01/1906 PDS VACATED 7/18/90.
12/04/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/28/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD DSA
01/17/1990DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (16 PGS. -- MOLLICHELLI) RJG PANEL SCDATE 020290 SCHPRD R
02/20/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 031590 SCHPRD BA
02/26/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (204-PGS/GOAD) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (138-PGS/SHELTON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (119-PGS/SWARINGER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO STAY BRFING SCHD TO EXTENT BRIEF IS FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM ORD JB PANELRBH SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD U
06/26/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (APLT) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990FiledRecord Completed
07/18/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID ROSENTHAL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD BA
08/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO (?) NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 082790 SCHPRD BA
08/23/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF W/I 30 DAYS OF ORDER. NFX. JJ PANELFF SCDATE 082090 SCHPRD B
09/24/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (SEE MOTION) RJG PANEL SCDATE 092490 SCHPRD BA
10/24/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 101790 SCHPRD V
11/13/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 112690 SCHPRD BA
04/24/1991ORDER BRF OF APLE DUE IN 5 OR CASE TO BE SCHED ON REC & BRF OF APLT ALONE. DAS PANELJAC SCDATE 121990 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 24, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 042991 SCHPRD BE
05/01/1991ORDER GR APLE MO FOR EXT TIM FL BRF TO 5/24/19. NFX. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 042991 SCHPRD K
05/24/1991FiledBriefing Completed
05/24/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 052491 SCHPRD BE
11/13/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/13/1991SUBMITTED PANELFESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION (CAUSE RM FOR RESENTENCING) PANELFESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD