judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELROY LEWIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1456
Short Caption:ELROY LEWIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9365-88Filed Date:12/04/1989

Opening Event Date:12/04/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/01/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantElroy Lewis #126-532 NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LEWIS, ELROY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 01/05/90 ORD: NOT BE DISMISSD NOTE - 01 FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION AS NOTE - 02 HAVING BEEN NOTED FROM A NON- NOTE - 02 FINAL ORDER.
12/04/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/05/1990ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 & 2) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD R
02/05/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
02/05/1990ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION FROM A NON-FINAL ORDER. FVH PANELBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -BE CITE
02/14/1990RECEIVED LETTER & ATTACHMENT FROM APLT PRO SE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD