Case Information: 44849 | |||
Short Caption: | AMASSNAOU VS. CARTIER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A472727 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/16/2005 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/25/2006 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/10/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Rawlings Olson Cannon Gormley & Desruisseaux--check no. 79356. | ||
03/10/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-04811 | |
03/16/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/25/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 05-05884 | |
05/23/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 05-10113 | |
06/01/2005 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 05-10719 | |
06/23/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | ||
07/01/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/18/04 thorugh 02/28/05. To Court Reporter: Tessa Heishman. | 05-13124 | |
08/26/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 05-16968 | |
08/29/2005 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend the Time to Allow Appellants to file their Opening Brief. | 05-17074 | |
11/14/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Ms. Heishman and Ms. Graham have 20 days to file transcripts. The stipulation filed on August 29, 2005 is granted. We direct the clerk of the court to file the opening brief received on October 31, 2005. Motion filed August 26, 2005 is denied as moot. Fn[A copy of the transcript request is attached to this order.] | 05-22297 | |
11/14/2005 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 05-21460 | |
11/14/2005 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 05-21463 | |
11/22/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: February 28, 2005. Court Reporter: Sherry L. Graham. | 05-23069 | |
11/23/2005 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 05-23098 | |
12/21/2005 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 10/18/04. Court Reporter: Tessa Heishman. | 05-24817 | |
12/22/2005 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 05-24913 | |
01/25/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 06-01815 | |
01/25/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/11/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order." SNP07-MG/MD/MC | 07-00761 | |
02/07/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-02370 | |
02/07/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/20/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 12, 2007. | 07-02370 |