judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VINCENT MCSWAIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1439
Short Caption:VINCENT MCSWAIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14618-88Filed Date:10/20/1989

Opening Event Date:10/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/18/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/13/1990
Argued/Submitted:04/01/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/07/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVincent Mcswain N
Curt S. HansenYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Maritn D. Carpenter YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCSWAIN, VINCENT UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/13/90 ORD: BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 01 BY 10/30/90; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 02 BY 12/04/90; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 02 12/24/90; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 03 FEBRUARY 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 10/26/90 ORD: 9/13/90 ORD IS NOTE - 04 VACATED; GRANT MO OF APLT TO NOTE - 05 EXT TM TO EXTENT THAT THE BRF NOTE - 05 OF APLT TO BE FL BY 11/13/90; NOTE - 06 BRF OF APLE DUE BY 12/17/90 & NOTE - 06 REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE BY NOTE - 07 1/7/91; SCHED CASE ON MARCH NOTE - 07 CAL.
10/20/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/22/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CURT S. HANSEN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD DSA
02/05/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 121989 SCHPRD R
02/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(499 PGS/VAN BREMEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(12 PGS/GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (52 PGS. -- GLEASON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1990FiledRecord Completed
05/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (189 PGS. -- MOORE) RJG PANEL SCDATE 030790 SCHPRD RT
09/13/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1-3 FOR ADVANCE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. GR PANELFF SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD GR
10/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 103090 SCHPRD BA
10/26/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-07. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(83 PGS/V. BREMEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ONE WEEK RJG PANEL SCDATE 111390 SCHPRD BA
11/19/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLT DUE BY 11/20;CNSL TO HAND SERVE BRF OF APLE. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 112090 SCHPRD BA
12/13/1990FiledBriefing Completed
12/13/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 121790 SCHPRD BE
04/01/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/01/1991SUBMITTED PANELSCWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSCWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/07/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD