judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSE A. MOLDANADO V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1437
Short Caption:JOSE A. MOLDANADO V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5879-88Filed Date:10/27/1989

Opening Event Date:10/27/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/23/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/20/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJose A. Moldanado N
Richard A. SeligmanNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MULDANADO, JOSE A UNITED STATES
10/27/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/22/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD SELIGMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD DSA
02/22/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD R
02/23/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(18 PGS/SCHNEIDER) AD PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD RT
02/28/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD BA
03/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(58 PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD U
07/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (182 PGS.--KACZOROWSKI) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/27/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 082790 SCHPRD BA
08/30/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/30/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT MO TO VOLUNTARILY DISM APPEAL & APPEAL DISMISSED GW PANELRO SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD V
08/30/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
09/20/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD